Black, Graham (CPSO#: 91528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket, Ontario
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013