Black, Jason Todd (CPSO#: 71172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone: (905) 951-3696
Fax: (905) 951-3698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Todd Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Black ( CPSO# 71172 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone Number: (905) 951-3696

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON TODD BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999