Black, Karen Margaret (CPSO#: 29015)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Doctors Mail Room
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7200
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018