Black, Michael Darryl (CPSO#: 56728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
927 45th Street, Suite 301
West Palm Beach FL  33407
United States
Phone: (561) 227-9240
Fax: (561) 842-9570
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

927 45th Street, Suite 301
West Palm Beach FL  33407
United States
Phone: (561) 227-9240
Fax: (561) 842-9570
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DARRYL BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987