Black, Morry Phillip (CPSO#: 84265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
770 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 1X9
Phone: (905) 526-9661
Fax: (905) 523-1583
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morry Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Black ( CPSO# 84265 )

Business Address:
770 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 1X9
Phone Number: (905) 626-9661

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRY PHILLIP BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008