Black, Oludolapo Ope-Olu Onikepo (CPSO#: 41792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnyside Medical Arts Centre
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Suite 203
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 533-5575
Fax: (416) 533-5575
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUDOLAPO OPE-OLU ONIKEPO BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 May 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984