Black, William Patrick Galloway (CPSO#: 28602)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 1 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017