Blackman, Adam Simon (CPSO#: 65231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sleep Institute
Suite 507
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 488-6980
Fax: (416) 488-3998
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Blackman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blackman ( CPSO# 65231 )

Business Address:
Suite 507
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 488-6980

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM SIMON BLACKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993