Blackmore, Michael Guy (CPSO#: 59808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Danforth Ave
Suite 406
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (647) 352-6440
Fax: (647) 352-6441
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GUY BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1994