Blackstone, Ian Wilfred (CPSO#: 22471)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 224 Everlyn Avenue, Toronto, ON M6P 2Z9
Date Received: 06 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015