Blacquiere, Dylan Paul Vincent (CPSO#: 86477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9 Tel: 6137614709 Fax: 6137615360
Date Received: 27 Jun 2014


Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 13 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DYLAN PAUL VINCENT BLACQUIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACQUIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018