Blacutt, Claudio Marcelo (CPSO#: 80526)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Mayor, Real Y Pontificia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2004 to 24 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006