Blain, Allison Marie (CPSO#: 77593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: Hall, Allison Marie (used until: 25 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Site
Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main St West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44621
Fax: (905) 577-8022
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wellbeing Pain & Dependency Clinic
Unit 2
185 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2C4
Canada
Phone: (905) 631-9355
Fax: (905) 631-1400
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Blain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blain ( CPSO# 77593 )

Business Address:
Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
185 Plains Road East
Suite 2
Burlington ON  L7T 2C4
Phone Number: (905) 631-9355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON MARIE BLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008