Blaine, Kirsten Ann (CPSO#: 65406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Van Staalduinen, Kirsten Ann (used until: 03 Jun 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blaine ( CPSO# 65406 )

Business Address:
Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 272-2040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ANN BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993