Blair, Cynthia Lyn (CPSO#: 50122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Nov 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Beard, Cynthia Lyn (used until: 02 Oct 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road, Suite 350
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-2295
Fax: (905) 829-0779
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Blair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin ( CPSO# 51387 )
Dr. C. Blair ( CPSO# 50122 )

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 350
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 842-2295


Corporation Name: Dr. Lorne Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin ( CPSO# 51387 )
Dr. C. Blair ( CPSO# 50122 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4456

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., June 20, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Cynthia Lyn Blair:

                  a.    Dr. Blair shall be prohibited from performing or engaging in the
                        performance of  liposuction procedures; 
                  
                  b.    At her own expense, Dr. Blair shall retain a College approved
                        preceptor on record keeping in relation to her cosmetic practice
                        for a period of six months, and who has signed an undertaking in
                        the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A" (the "Cosmetic
                        Practice Preceptor").  The Cosmetic Practice Preceptor shall meet
                        with Dr. Blair monthly and review a minimum of 10 randomly chosen
                        patient records per month with reports to the College every two
                        months.  Dr. Blair will abide at her own expense by all
                        recommendations of the Cosmetic Practice Preceptor with respect to
                        her medical record keeping, including with respect to any charting
                        improvements; and
                  
                  c.    At her own expense, Dr. Blair shall retain a College approved
                        preceptor for her family practice for a period of six months, and
                        who has signed an undertaking in the form attached [to the Order]
                        as Schedule "B" (the "Family Practice Preceptor").  The Family
                        Practice Preceptor shall meet with Dr. Blair monthly and review a
                        minimum of 10 patient records per month with reports to the College
                        every two months.  
                  
                  
            As from March 12, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Cynthia Lyn Blair, in
            accordance with an undertaking 
            Dr. Blair has given to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, DR. CYNTHIA LYN BLAIR, certificate of registration number 50122, am a
                  member of the College.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (1)   I, DR. CYNTHIA LYN BLAIR, undertake to the College that I will contact
                  the Quality Assurance Program of the College within 30 days of the
                  execution of this Undertaking and submit to an assessment of my laser
                  skin resurfacing practice.  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (1)   I, DR. CYNTHIA LYN BLAIR, acknowledge that a breach of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct, or, where
                  appropriate, failure to maintain the standard of practice and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

            (2)   I, DR. CYNTHIA LYN BLAIR, acknowledge that if a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee is made in relation to an alleged
                  breach of the terms of this Undertaking, the College will be entitled to
                  introduce this Undertaking as evidence at a hearing before the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (3)   I, DR. CYNTHIA LYN BLAIR, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking and its
                  Appendices. 

            (4)   I, DR. CYNTHIA LYN BLAIR, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that
                  I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            I understand that such specified terms, conditions and limitations shall be
            information on the College's Register that is available to the public.





Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jun 2011
Summary:

On June 20, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cynthia Lyn Blair has committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, and in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of 
registration. The Committee also found that Dr. Cynthia Lyn Blair is incompetent. 
 
Dr. Blair failed to maintain the standard of practice in her care and treatment of 27 liposuction 
patients in that: she failed to employ appropriate sterile technique; her facility is inadequate for 
the performance of invasive surgical procedures (i.e. liposuction); her pre-operative care of 
liposuction patients is substandard; her intra-operative care of liposuction patients is substandard; 
her discharge of patients is substandard; and her charting is substandard. Dr. Blair also failed to 
maintain the standard of practice in her charting of patients for whom she administered botox and 
other injectables. 
 
Dr. Blair contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration by 
practising in an area of medicine in which she is not educated and experienced.  
 
The Committee also found that Dr. Blair is incompetent with respect to liposuction. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Blair attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Blair's 
      certificate of registration:  
 
      a.    Dr. Blair shall be prohibited from performing or engaging in the performance of  
            liposuction procedures;  
 
      b.    At her own expense, Dr. Blair shall retain a College approved preceptor on record 
            keeping in relation to her cosmetic practice for a period of six months, and who 
            has signed an undertaking in the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A" (the 
            "Cosmetic Practice Preceptor").  The Cosmetic Practice Preceptor shall meet with 
            Dr. Blair monthly and review a minimum of 10 randomly chosen patient records 
            per month with reports to the College every two months.  Dr. Blair will abide at 
            her own expense by all recommendations of the Cosmetic Practice Preceptor with 
            respect to her medical record keeping, including with respect to any charting 
            improvements; and 
 
      c.    At her own expense, Dr. Blair shall retain a College approved preceptor for her 
            family practice for a period of six months, and who has signed an undertaking in 
            the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B" (the "Family Practice 
            Preceptor").  The Family Practice Preceptor shall meet with Dr. Blair monthly 
            and review a minimum of 10 patient records per month with reports to the College 
            every two months.   
 
3.    Dr. Blair shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of 
      $30,000.00. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 31-June 3, June 20-22, 2011