Blair, Donald Cameron (CPSO#: 23496)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Blair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013