Blair, John Knox (CPSO#: 26279)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Science, 237 Barton Street East, Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015