Blair, Mairi Mackenzie (CPSO#: 30738)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1988