Blair, Norman Peter (CPSO#: 31527)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1988