Blais, Andre (CPSO#: 67595)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 13 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994