Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Blais, Robert Denis (CPSO#: 59065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
28 Mont Bleu
Gatineau QC  J8Z 1J1
Phone: (819) 777-2111
Fax: (819) 771-6890

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DENIS BLAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008