Blajchman, Morris Aaron (CPSO#: 23405)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: blajchma@mcmaster.ca
Date Received: 12 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016