Blake, Anastasia Marie (CPSO#: 98377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4045
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: 519-376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anastasia Marie Blake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blake ( CPSO# 98377 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
1800 8th Street
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANASTASIA MARIE BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014