Blake, Elizabeth Kathleen (CPSO#: 71529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V6
Phone: (905) 701-6643
Fax: (905) 701-6645
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Blake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blake ( CPSO# 71529 )

Business Address:
410 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V6
Phone Number: (905) 701-6643

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH KATHLEEN BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999