Blake, Gary George (CPSO#: 28245)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.G. Blake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013