Blake, Peter Gerard (CPSO#: 57949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8326
Fax: (519) 685-8470
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G. Blake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Blake ( CPSO# 57949 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Westminster Site
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8326

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GERARD BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1992