Blakslee, James Michael (CPSO#: 57210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
560 Albert Street
P O Box 790
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-1445
Fax: (613) 774-1926
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville and District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
P O Box 2007
Kemptville ON  K0E 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Blakslee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Blakslee ( CPSO# 57210 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
560 Albert Street
P O Box 790
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-1445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL BLAKSLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKSLEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987