Blanchard, Joseph Rosaire Andre Guy (CPSO#: 16846)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1958
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Sep 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1990