Blanchard, Joseph Ulric Bernard Julien (CPSO#: 16559)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1958
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Oct 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1990