Blanco, Paula Leticia (CPSO#: 99895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2013

Expiry Date:  13 Feb 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Pathology and Laboratory Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75350
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Paula Leticia Blanco may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pathology
                        and  Laboratory Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Blanco
                        holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Blanco  no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Blanco's clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Blanco's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  February  14, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 13, 2020.