Blaser, Susan Irene (CPSO#: 61455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6888
Fax: (416) 813-5471
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MSH
600 University Avenue
Toronto, ON
M5G 1W7
Toronto ON  M5G 1W7
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6888
Fax: (416) 813-5869
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN IRENE BLASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLASER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jun 1994