Blastorah, Bernard Joseph (CPSO#: 60928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 740-9690
Fax: (705) 740-9689
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Blastorah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Blastorah ( CPSO# 60928 )

Business Address:
Unit 301
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 740-9690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD JOSEPH BLASTORAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLASTORAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1993