Blayney, Marc Peter (CPSO#: 43303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Moncton Hospital
135 MacBeath Avenue
Moncton NB  E1C 6Z8
Phone: (506) 857-5979
Fax: (506) 857-5768
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Blayney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blayney ( CPSO# 43303 )

Business Address:
The Moncton Hospital
135 MacBeath Avenue
Moncton NB  E1C 6C8
Phone Number: (506) 857-5979

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC PETER BLAYNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAYNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1991