Blecher, Peter Martin (CPSO#: 65374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CPM Centre for Pain Management
Unit 2
500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone: (905) 576-3444
Fax: (905) 576-7980
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health-Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4749
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter M. Blecher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Blecher ( CPSO# 65374 )

Business Address:
2 - 500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone Number: (905) 576-3444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 8, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Martin Blecher, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Blecher has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. PETER MARTIN BLECHER
                                            ("Dr. Blecher")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Blecher, certificate of registration number 65374, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number #7215117 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor") for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me in the first, second, third and sixth month of
                              the Clinical Supervision to review at least twenty-five (25)
                              of my patient charts chosen at random;
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once after
                              each meeting with me in the first, second, third and sixth
                              month of the Clinical Supervision or more frequently if the
                              Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of
                              practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the areas of concern
                        identified in the report of the medical inspector dated September
                        21, 2015, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Blecher, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Blecher, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                              (i)   a 2000-word written summary of "College Policy #4-12:
                                    Medical Records"; and
                  
                              (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                                    Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to complete this requirement within
                        twelve (12) months of the Effective Date.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor").  I acknowledge and agree
                        that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor that are approved by
                        the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may
                        discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Blecher, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Blecher, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Blecher, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Blecher was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        emergency room practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Blecher will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6
                                    months. 
                              *     Dr. Blecher will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record keeping.
                              *     Dr. Blecher's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Blecher, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Blecher, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Blecher, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: December 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Martin Blecher to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 30, 2016:

Dr. Blecher was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his emergency room practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Blecher will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Blecher will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.
• Dr. Blecher’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.