Bleszynski, Maria Eva (CPSO#: 55269)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1996