Blew, Philip Gordon (CPSO#: 63574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6019
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Blew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Blew ( CPSO# 63574 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP GORDON BLEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLEW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992