Bleyendaal, Argia (CPSO#: 54305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: Giachini, Argia (used until: 27 Oct 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1550
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone: (519) 944-0683
Fax: (519) 944-3005
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Argia Bleyendaal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bleyendaal ( CPSO# 54305 )

Business Address:
Unit 1550
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 944-0683

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARGIA BLEYENDAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLEYENDAAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1986