Blichowski, Teresa Danuta (CPSO#: 65757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 1
294 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 4E3
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-4787
Fax: (519) 631-7023
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Canada
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 48300
Fax: (519) 455-2919
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teresa D. Blichowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Blichowski ( CPSO# 65757 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA DANUTA BLICHOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLICHOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1996