Blier, Joseph Jacques Jean (CPSO#: 42756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 748-4914
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kanata Plastic and Cosmetic Surgery
895 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Canada
Phone: (613) 591-1099
Fax: (613) 591-1077
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Blier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Blier ( CPSO# 42756 )

Business Address:
895 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone Number: (613) 591-1093

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH JACQUES JEAN BLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984