Blight, Katherine Renee (CPSO#: 73835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department Of Anasthesia
1800 8th Street East
Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Blight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blight ( CPSO# 73835 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Anaesthesia
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE RENEE BLIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2004