Blinkina, Anna Alexandrovna (CPSO#: 87651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K5H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Blinkina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blinkina ( CPSO# 87651 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ALEXANDROVNA BLINKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLINKINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2011