Blitzer, Steve Arthur (CPSO#: 33351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard at Yonge
Thornhill ON  L3T 3C3
Phone: (905) 881-1661
Fax: (905) 881-1710
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Blitzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blitzer ( CPSO# 33351 )

Business Address:
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill ON  L3T 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 881-1661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVE ARTHUR BLITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLITZER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985