Bloch, Christine Lynn (CPSO#: 58178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5S8
Phone: (519) 273-4200
Fax: (519) 273-1009
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Bloch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bloch ( CPSO# 58178 )

Business Address:
150 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5S8
Phone Number: (519) 273-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LYNN BLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2000