Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bloch, Peter Gunsberg (CPSO#: 27343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Bloch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bloch ( CPSO# 27343 )

Business Address:
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 827-9865

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GUNSBERG BLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975