Block, Jennifer Katherine (CPSO#: 79041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bank Respiratory Services
Suite 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Block Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Block ( CPSO# 79041 )

Business Address:
Bank Respiratory Services
Suite 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 523-4444

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHERINE BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008