Block, Stephanie Karen (CPSO#: 72691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Heinrichs, Stephanie Karen Block (used until: 28 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Rd.
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Block Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Block ( CPSO# 72691 )

Business Address:
Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE KAREN BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000