Blois, Heather Susan (CPSO#: 64227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: 613-725-2000 Ext. 708
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Blois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER SUSAN BLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991