Blondal, John August (CPSO#: 64635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joesph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6586
Fax: (416) 530-6356
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Blondal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Blondal ( CPSO# 64635 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6586

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN AUGUST BLONDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLONDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991