Blondin, Michel (CPSO#: 64991)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 10 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1992
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 13 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 10 Jun 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 2002
Summary:

 On June 10, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Blondin guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he sexually abused patients.  The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Blondin(s certificate of 
 registration be revoked immediately.  The Discipline Committee also ordered a recorded reprimand.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 10, 2002