Bloom, Carl Matthew (CPSO#: 67433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bramalea Medical Centre
Suite 206
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 793-5858
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bramalea Medical Centre
Suite 206
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 4S5
Canada
Phone: (905) 793-5858
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carl Bloom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bloom ( CPSO# 67433 )

Business Address:
College & Markham X-Ray
474 College
BSMT #4
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 925-3823

Business Address:
College & Markham Nuclear
474 College Street
BSMT. #3
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 925-3823

Business Address:
Oakville Diagnostic Imaging
#B-1 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-0014

Business Address:
Oakville Nuclear Diagnostic
#B-4 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 815-8590

Business Address:
St. Clair X-Ray & Ultrasound
Main Floor - 1223 St. Clair West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 656-6034

Business Address:
St. Clair & Dufferin Nuclear
1223 St. Clair West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 656-6034

Business Address:
Yonge & Balmoral X-Ray & Ultrasound
101 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 975-8951

Business Address:
Dufferin/Rosemount
104-105 - 1615 Dufferin Street BSMT.
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone Number: (416) 656-5353

Business Address:
College & Grace X-Ray
Main Floor - 622 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A1
Phone Number: (416) 534-6868

Business Address:
Lawrence & Black Creek Ultrasound
208 - 1635 Lawrence Avenue
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 266-8862

Business Address:
Keswick X-Ray & Ultrasound
204 - 417 The Queensway
Keswick ON  M4P 2C9
Phone Number: (905) 989-0911

Business Address:
Dufferin X-Ray & Ultrasound
B1 - 1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 656-7400

Business Address:
Victoria Park X-Ray
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone Number: (416) 694-2198

Business Address:
Donvale X-Ray
597 Parliament Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W3
Phone Number: (416) 972-9650

Business Address:
Donvale Ultrasound
597 Parliament Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W3
Phone Number: (416) 972-9650

Business Address:
CML Healthcare
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 565-0043

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-3624

Business Address:
CML
418 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 260-9382

Business Address:
Bramalea Medical Centre
206 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 793-5858

Business Address:
Fast Track Imaging
B09 - 3850 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3E7

Business Address:
Gore Diagnostic Imaging
Unit 2 - 4525 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARL MATTHEW BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1993